Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel de Bulhões e Souza, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Leiria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1706³BornVerdemilho, Portugal
4 Mar 173023.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Preachers
12 Mar 173023.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
3 Jan 174639.7SelectedBishop of Malacca, Singapore
28 Mar 174639.9ConfirmedBishop of Malacca, Singapore
29 Jun 174640.2Ordained BishopBishop of Malacca, Singapore
11 Jan 174841.7SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil
19 Feb 174841.8ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil
18 May 174842.0SucceededBishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil
30 Nov 175953.6SelectedBishop of Leiria, Portugal
24 Mar 176053.9ConfirmedBishop of Leiria, Portugal
14 Sep 177973.4DiedBishop of Leiria, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Miguel de Bulhões e Souza:
Bishop Miguel de Bulhões e Souza O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Leiria

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 33.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1746, Number 29
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 118, and Page 257
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 273

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015