Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfons Bermijn (Bermyn), C.I.C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Southwestern Mongolia {Mongolia Occiduo-Meridionale}, China

Titular Bishop of Stratonicea in Lydia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1853Born
10 Jun 187622.8Ordained PriestPriest
4 Mar 187824.5ProfessedPriest of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
15 Apr 190147.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Southwestern Mongolia {Mongolia Occiduo-Meridionale}, China
15 Apr 190147.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Stratonicea in Lydia
26 Jan 190248.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Stratonicea in Lydia
16 Feb 191561.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Southwestern Mongolia {Mongolia Occiduo-Meridionale}, China

MicroData Summary for Alfons Bermijn (Bermyn) (VIAF: 25663583)
Bishop Alfons Bermijn (Bermyn) C.I.C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Southwestern Mongolia {Mongolia Occiduo-Meridionale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint Paul de Waes, Diocese of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
Ordained BishopPeking
Death PlaceKangfangyintze

  • a priest for 38.6 years
  • a bishop for 13.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 528
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1902, Number 5
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 55, Number 4,017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast