Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Alphonse Armand Vanuytven, O. Praem. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Buta

Titular Bishop of Megara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1880BornGheel
28 Dec 190323.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Canons Regular of Premontre; Norbertines
25 Apr 192444.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Western Uélé {Uélé Occidental}, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
25 Apr 192444.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Megara
11 Sep 192444.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Megara
Dec 1952³72.6ResignedVicar Apostolic of Buta, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
18 Mar 196988.9DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Buta, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles Alphonse Armand Vanuytven:
Bishop Charles Alphonse Armand Vanuytven O. Praem. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Buta

  • a priest for 65.2 years
  • a bishop for 44.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013