Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Cirillo

Deceased

Bishop of Nicastro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1639BornTorre del Greco
22 Sep 166324.1Ordained PriestPriest
7 Jul 169252.9AppointedBishop of Nicastro, Italy
13 Jul 169252.9Ordained BishopBishop of Nicastro, Italy
23 Jan 170969.5DiedBishop of Nicastro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicola Cirillo:
Bishop Nicola Cirillo (born , died ) Bishop of Nicastro

  • a priest for 45.3 years
  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 284
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1692, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 27 Apr 2015