Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Antonio Valarezo Luzuriaga, O.F.M.

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Galápagos

Titular Bishop of Quaestoriana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1937 BornMalvas-Zaruma
11 Aug 196225.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
22 Jun 199053.0AppointedPrefect of Galápagos, Ecuador
22 Apr 199658.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Quaestoriana
23 Jun 199659.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Quaestoriana
15 Jul 200871.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Galápagos, Ecuador
29 Oct 201376.4RetiredVicar Apostolic of Galápagos, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Manuel Antonio Valarezo Luzuriaga:
Bishop Manuel Antonio Valarezo Luzuriaga O.F.M. (born ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Galápagos

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Galápagos.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Jul 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,762
  • r: Bollettino, 29 Oct 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 12 Dec 2013