Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Dionizy (Roman) Kajetanowicz

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1878Born
1896¹17.7EnteredMember of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
1897²18.7ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
7 Jul 190325.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
1908²29.7IncardinatedPriest of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine
1938²59.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine
18 Nov 195476.6DiedApostolic Administrator of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Dionizy (Roman) Kajetanowicz (VIAF: 101965849)
Father Dionizy (Roman) Kajetanowicz (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Lviv

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTyshkivtsi
Death PlaceAbez concentration camp

  • a priest for 51.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 21 Dec 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018