Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Cumino

Deceased

Bishop of Biella, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1837Born
22 Sep 186022.8Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jan 188648.2AppointedBishop of Biella, Italy
16 May 188648.5Ordained BishopBishop of Biella, Italy
29 Jun 190163.6DiedBishop of Biella, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Cumino
Bishop Domenico Cumino (born , died ) Bishop of Biella

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAndezeno, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}
Ordained BishopTorino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}

  • a priest for 40.7 years
  • a bishop for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 162
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1886, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 May 2017