Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Santiago (Giacomo) Costamagna, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Méndez y Gualaquiza

Titular Bishop of Colonia in Armenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1846BornCaramagna Piemonte, Italy
Jun 1868³22.4Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
18 Mar 189549.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Méndez y Gualaquiza, Ecuador
18 Mar 189549.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Colonia in Armenia
23 May 189549.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Colonia in Armenia
1919¹73.0ResignedVicar Apostolic of Méndez y Gualaquiza, Ecuador
8 Sep 192175.7DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Méndez y Gualaquiza, Ecuador

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Santiago (Giacomo) Costamagna:
Bishop Santiago (Giacomo) Costamagna S.D.B. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Méndez y Gualaquiza

  • a priest for 53.3 years
  • a bishop for 26.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 215

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013