Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele Sanseverino

Deceased

Bishop of Gaeta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1754BornFoggia
19 Jun 177824.1Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jun 180551.1AppointedBishop of Gaeta, Italy
30 Jun 180551.2Ordained BishopBishop of Gaeta, Italy
1812¹57.7DiedBishop of Gaeta, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michele Sanseverino:
Bishop Michele Sanseverino (born ) Bishop of Gaeta

  • a priest for 33.5 years
  • a bishop for 6.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013