Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Vincent de Beni

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Carpentras


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1729BornGubbio
25 Aug 177647.5Ordained PriestPriest
16 Sep 177647.6AppointedBishop of Carpentras, France
29 Sep 177647.6Ordained BishopBishop of Carpentras, France
11 Jun 177748.3InstalledBishop of Carpentras, France
180171.9ResignedBishop of Carpentras, France
12 Jan 180676.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Carpentras, France

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Vincent de Beni:
Bishop Joseph-Vincent de Beni (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Carpentras

  • a priest for 29.4 years
  • a bishop for 29.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 149, and Page 339

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013