Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Domenico Cardinal Pignatelli di Belmonte, C.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Palermo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1730BornNapoli
22 Sep 175322.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
22 Apr 177746.4AppointedSuperior General of Congregation of Clerics Regular
9 Jan 178251.1SelectedBishop of Caserta, Italy
25 Feb 178251.2ConfirmedBishop of Caserta, Italy
3 Mar 178251.2Ordained BishopBishop of Caserta, Italy
29 Mar 180271.3AppointedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
9 Aug 180271.7Elevated to Cardinal
5 Feb 180372.2DiedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Pignatelli di Belmonte:
Domenico Cardinal Pignatelli di Belmonte C.R. (born , died ) Archbishop of Palermo

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 20.9 years
  • a cardinal for .4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 152
  • bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 298
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1782, Number 3
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Aug 1802

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 31 Dec 2015