Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François de Carbonnel de Canisy

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Limoges


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1655¹BornAvranches
8 Sep 169540.6SelectedBishop of Limoges, France
23 Jan 169641.0ConfirmedBishop of Limoges, France
25 Mar 169641.2Ordained BishopBishop of Limoges, France
13 Sep 170651.6ResignedBishop of Limoges, France
28 Oct 172368.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Limoges, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for François de Carbonnel de Canisy:
Bishop François de Carbonnel de Canisy (born 1655, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Limoges

  • a bishop for 27.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 241
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1696, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 2 May 2015