Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Fellinger

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine

Titular Bishop of Nisyrus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1865Born
1888²22.7Ordained PriestPriest
26 Feb 192963.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
26 Feb 192963.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Nisyrus
7 Apr 192964.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nisyrus
22 Jul 194075.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franz Fellinger
Bishop Franz Fellinger (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLinz, Austria

  • a priest for 52.5 years
  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • op/ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1929, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast