Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ronald Philippe Bär, O.S.B.

Bishop Emeritus of Rotterdam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1928 BornManado
29 Dec 195527.4ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
26 Jul 195931.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
15 Jan 198253.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rotterdam, Netherlands
15 Jan 198253.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Leges
20 Mar 198253.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Leges
22 Nov 198254.3AppointedBishop of Netherlands, Military
19 Oct 198355.2AppointedBishop of Rotterdam, Netherlands
13 Mar 199364.6ResignedBishop of Rotterdam, Netherlands
13 Mar 199364.6ResignedBishop of Netherlands, Military

MicroData Summary for Ronald Philippe Bär:
Bishop Ronald Philippe Bär O.S.B. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Rotterdam

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Rotterdam.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013