Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François de Baillencourt

Deceased

Bishop of Brugge {Bruges}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1610BornNijvel
22 Sep 163525.2Ordained PriestPriest
30 Aug 166959.2SelectedBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
18 Mar 167160.7ConfirmedBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
28 Jun 167161.0Ordained BishopBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
3 Nov 168171.3DiedBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for François de Baillencourt:
Bishop François de Baillencourt (born , died ) Bishop of Brugge {Bruges}

  • a priest for 46.1 years
  • a bishop for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica
  • b: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1671, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 18 Apr 2015