Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugenius Albertus d’Allamont

Deceased

Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1625BornBrussel
20 Sep 165429.1Ordained PriestPriest
11 Mar 165933.6AppointedBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
24 Aug 165934.0Ordained BishopBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
8 Nov 166237.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
1 Feb 166640.5SelectedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
7 Jun 166640.8ConfirmedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
29 Oct 166641.2InstalledBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
28 Aug 167348.0DiedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Eugenius Albertus d’Allamont:
Bishop Eugenius Albertus d’Allamont (born , died ) Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}

  • a priest for 18.9 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 125, and Page 193
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1659, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 30 Mar 2015