Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominic Burke, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Elphin, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1629¹Born
1670²41.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
13 Jul 167142.5AppointedBishop of Elphin, Ireland
22 Nov 167142.8Ordained BishopBishop of Elphin, Ireland
1 Jan 170475.0DiedBishop of Elphin, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Dominic Burke
Bishop Dominic Burke O.P. (born 1629, died ) Bishop of Elphin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCraughwell, Co. Galway
Ordained BishopGent, Diocese of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
Buried Place (Original)St. Anthony's, Leuven

  • a priest for 34.0 years
  • a bishop for 32.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 194
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 182
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1671, Number 52
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast