Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aubertus van den Eede

Deceased

Bishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1603BornBrussels
8 Apr 162825.0Ordained PriestPriest
13 Sep 167774.4AppointedBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium
31 Oct 167774.6Ordained BishopBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium
2 Nov 167875.6DiedBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Aubertus van den Eede:
Bishop Aubertus van den Eede (born , died ) Bishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}

  • a priest for 50.5 years
  • a bishop for 1.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 90
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1677, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 14 Apr 2015