Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Frans van Horenbeke

Deceased

Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1629BornBrussels
21 Mar 165425.1Ordained PriestPriest
24 May 167748.3AppointedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
25 Jul 167748.5Ordained BishopBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
4 Jan 167949.9DiedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Frans van Horenbeke:
Bishop Frans van Horenbeke (born , died ) Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}

  • a priest for 24.7 years
  • a bishop for 1.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 208
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1677, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 14 Apr 2015