Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Albert de Hornes

Deceased

Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1642BornBraines la Chateau
1 Mar 167028.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
5 Apr 167028.1Ordained PriestPriest
13 Jan 168138.8AppointedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
1 Jun 168139.2Ordained BishopBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
4 Jun 169452.2DiedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Albert de Hornes:
Bishop Albert de Hornes (born , died ) Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}

  • a priest for 24.1 years
  • a bishop for 13.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 208
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1681, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 18 Apr 2015