Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Domingo Barbosa Da Silveira

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Minas, Uruguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1944Born
17 Jun 197228.2Ordained PriestPriest of Salto, Uruguay
6 Mar 200459.9AppointedBishop of Minas, Uruguay
8 May 200460.1Ordained BishopBishop of Minas, Uruguay
1 Jul 200965.2ResignedBishop of Minas, Uruguay
17 Jun 201571.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Minas, Uruguay

MicroData Summary for Francisco Domingo Barbosa Da Silveira
Bishop Francisco Domingo Barbosa Da Silveira (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Minas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTambores

  • a priest for 43.0 years
  • a bishop for 11.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,590
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Jul 2009
  • d: CB, 17 Jun 2015
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast