Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrij Bacynskyj

Deceased

Bishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1732BornBeniatyno
2 Sep 175623.8Ordained PriestPriest of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
5 Aug 177239.7SelectedBishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
8 Mar 177340.3ConfirmedBishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
6 Jun 177340.5Ordained BishopBishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
19 Nov 180977.0DiedBishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Andrij Bacynskyj:
Bishop Andrij Bacynskyj (born , died ) Bishop of Mukachevo (Munkács)

  • a priest for 53.2 years
  • a bishop for 36.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 298
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117
  • bp/bd/c34: CB, 1 Feb 2013
  • op: CB, 5 Jun 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 10 Jun 2015