Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregor Tarkovič (Tárkovits)

Deceased

Bishop of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian), Slovakia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1754Born
20 Dec 177824.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
1 Jan 177924.1Ordained PriestPriest of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
11 Jul 181762.6SelectedBishop of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian), Slovakia
2 Oct 181863.8ConfirmedBishop of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian), Slovakia
17 Jun 182166.5Ordained BishopBishop of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian), Slovakia
16 Jan 184186.1DiedBishop of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian), Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Gregor Tarkovič (Tárkovits)
Bishop Gregor Tarkovič (Tárkovits) (born , died ) Bishop of Prešov (Prjašev)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePaszika, Ukraine
Ordained BishopHoly Spirit, Monastery, Krásny Brod

  • a priest for 62.0 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 187
  • c01: CB, 5 Jun 2015
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1821, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast