Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josafat Bastasic (Bastasyc), O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1740BornMerzlopolye
8 Apr 178847.9SelectedBishop of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia
30 Mar 178948.9ConfirmedBishop of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia
6 Dec 179050.5Ordained BishopBishop of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia
28 Aug 179353.3DiedBishop of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Josafat Bastasic (Bastasyc)
Bishop Josafat Bastasic (Bastasyc) O.S.B.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Križevci (Kreutz)

  • a bishop for 2.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 187
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,766
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Number 15,534
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1790, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 3 Jun 2016