Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Silvester Bubanovich, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1754³BornPechno
15 Mar 177823.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
19 Mar 177823.4Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
20 Jun 179439.6SelectedBishop of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia
22 Sep 179540.9ConfirmedBishop of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia
8 Nov 179541.0Ordained BishopBishop of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia
14 Jun 181055.6DiedBishop of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Silvester Bubanovich
Bishop Silvester Bubanovich O.S.B.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Križevci (Kreutz)

  • a priest for 32.2 years
  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 187
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1795, Number 32
  • OSBM: CB, 30 May 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 3 Jun 2016