Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Krikor Ayvazian

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kamichlié (Armenian), Syria

Titular Bishop of Marasc degli Armeni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jun 1912Born
6 Sep 193624.1Ordained PriestPriest
6 Dec 197260.4AppointedBishop of Kamichlié (Armenian), Syria
25 Feb 197360.6Ordained BishopBishop of Kamichlié (Armenian), Syria
18 Nov 198876.3RetiredBishop of Kamichlié (Armenian), Syria
23 Nov 198876.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Marasc degli Armeni
21 Jan 199784.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Kamichlié (Armenian), Syria

MicroData Summary for Krikor Ayvazian
Bishop Krikor Ayvazian (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kamichlié

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarache

  • a priest for 60.3 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast