Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Arnaouti, I.C.P.B.

Patriarchal Exarch of Damas (Armenian), Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1936 Born
5 Apr 196932.9Ordained PriestPriest of Institut du Clergé Patriarcal de Bzommar
21 Aug 198953.3AppointedBishop of Kamichlié (Armenian), Syria
18 Mar 199053.8Ordained BishopBishop of Kamichlié (Armenian), Syria
10 Apr 199255.9ResignedBishop of Kamichlié (Armenian), Syria
24 May 199458.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Gregorio de Narek en Buenos Aires (Armenian), Argentina
199760.6AppointedPatriarchal Exarch of Damas (Armenian), Syria
199760.6AppointedCurial Bishop of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon
199962.6ResignedCurial Bishop of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Joseph Arnaouti
Bishop Joseph Arnaouti I.C.P.B. (born ) Patriarchal Exarch of Damas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlep

Please contact the Bishop through the Patriarchal Exarchate of Damas (Armenian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,426
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,535

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 25 Jun 2018

Quantcast