Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Barry Philip Jones

Deceased

Bishop of Christchurch


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1941BornNorth Canterbury
4 Jul 196624.7Ordained PriestPriest of Christchurch, New Zealand
28 Jun 200664.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Christchurch, New Zealand
4 Oct 200665.0Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Christchurch, New Zealand
4 May 200765.5SucceededBishop of Christchurch, New Zealand
13 Feb 201674.3DiedBishop of Christchurch, New Zealand

MicroData Summary for Barry Philip Jones
Bishop Barry Philip Jones (born , died ) Bishop of Christchurch

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Number 15,272
  • s: Bollettino, 4 May 2007
  • d: CB, 12 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016