Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Mtwara

Dioecesis Mtuaranus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Gabriel Mmole, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 18 December 1972
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Songea
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Tanzania, United Republic of
  • Square Kilometers: 7,780 (3,005 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: P.O. Box 526, Mtwara, Tanzania
  • Telephone: (023)2333.071

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Territorial Abbey of Ndanda
22 December 1931ErectedDiocese of Lindi Territorial Abbey of Ndanda (erected)
5 August 1963Territory LostTerritorial Abbey of Ndanda Diocese of Nachingwea (erected)
Diocese of Mtwara
18 December 1972ElevatedTerritorial Abbey of Ndanda Diocese of Mtwara

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Territorial Abbey of Ndanda
195031,326660,0004.7%31311,010353418ap1951
197059,343670,7008.8%10607084710090ap1971
Diocese of Mtwara
198072,9151,060,0006.9%2145661,1047612529ap1981
199048,870808,0006.0%1622381,286429214ap1991
199961,019720,1428.5%2120411,4885017916ap2000
200062,877731,9888.6%2120411,5334921015ap2001
200166,708741,7159.0%2020401,6674720815ap2002
200266,370752,9458.8%2222441,5085122315ap2003
200360,859723,4338.4%2224461,3235022115ap2004
200462,273689,1649.0%2520451,3834421315ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.0, 29 Jul 2012; data: 20 Aug 2012