Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Felix Jacovacci

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Palestrina, Italy

Titular Bishop of Erythrae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1821Born
23 Dec 184322.8Ordained PriestPriest
1 Oct 186342.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Palestrina, Italy
1 Oct 186342.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Erythrae
18 Oct 186342.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Erythrae
10 Jun 187958.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Palestrina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Felix Jacovacci
Bishop Giovanni Felix Jacovacci (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Palestrina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlatri
Ordained BishopNotre Dame du Bon Conseil, Genazzano

  • a priest for 35.4 years
  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 261
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1863, Number 15
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 40, Number 2,483

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast