Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Celestino Maria Cocle, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Patrae (Veters)

Titular See: (Rector Major)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1783BornSan Giovanni Rotondo, Italy
21 Nov 180017.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
17 Sep 180622.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
11 Jun 182440.6AppointedRector General of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
30 Sep 183147.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Patrae (Veters)
13 Oct 183147.9ResignedRector General of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
1 Nov 183147.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Patrae (Veters)
3 Mar 185773.3DiedTitular Archbishop of Patrae (Veters)

MicroData Summary for Celestino Maria Cocle:
Archbishop Celestino Maria Cocle C.SS.R. (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Patrae (Veters)

  • a priest for 50.5 years
  • a bishop for 25.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 301
  • bp/bd/op/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013