Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele Maria Caputo, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ariano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1808Born
8 Jan 183224.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
12 Jun 185244.4SelectedBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
27 Sep 185244.7ConfirmedBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
3 Oct 185244.7Ordained BishopBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
27 Sep 185850.7AppointedBishop of Ariano, Italy
6 Sep 186254.6DiedBishop of Ariano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michele Maria Caputo (VIAF: 194798949)
Bishop Michele Maria Caputo O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Ariano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNardò
Ordained BishopS. Laurent in Damaso, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 30.6 years
  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 121, and Page 426
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1852, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast