Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Abelardo Alvarado Alcántara

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of México, Federal District

Titular Bishop of Thysdrus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1933 BornAcambay
26 Oct 195825.3Ordained PriestPriest
26 Apr 198551.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District
26 Apr 198551.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Thysdrus
14 Jun 198552.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thysdrus
22 Jul 200875.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District

MicroData Summary for Abelardo Alvarado Alcántara:
Bishop Abelardo Alvarado Alcántara (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of México

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of México.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Jul 2008
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015