Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Maria Aguilera González

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of México, Federal District

Titular Bishop of Macriana in Mauretania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1918Born
24 Apr 194324.9Ordained PriestPriest
5 Jun 197961.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District
5 Jun 197961.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Macriana in Mauretania
15 Aug 197961.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Macriana in Mauretania
12 Jan 199677.7RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District
6 Aug 201092.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of México, Federal District

MicroData Summary for Francisco Maria Aguilera González (VIAF: 151684394)
Bishop Francisco Maria Aguilera González (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of México

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuanajuato

  • a priest for 67.2 years
  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast