Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge Martínez Martínez

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District

Titular Bishop of Macomades Rusticiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1917Born
26 Oct 195841.0Ordained PriestPriest of México, Federal District
5 Jun 197153.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District
5 Jun 197153.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Macomades Rusticiana
16 Jul 197153.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Macomades Rusticiana
1 Aug 199476.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District

MicroData Summary for Jorge Martínez Martínez
Bishop Jorge Martínez Martínez (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of México

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMexico, Archdiocese of México, Federal District
Ordained BishopMexico, Archdiocese of México, Federal District

  • a priest for 35.7 years
  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 18, Number 971

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast