Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agustín Romualdo Alvarez Rodríguez, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Machiques, Venezuela

Titular Bishop of Nasbinca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1923Born
12 Mar 194926.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
10 Mar 198663.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Machiques, Venezuela
10 Mar 198663.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Nasbinca
7 Jun 198663.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nasbinca
7 Oct 199572.6ResignedVicar Apostolic of Machiques, Venezuela
11 Aug 201188.5DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Machiques, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Agustín Romualdo Alvarez Rodríguez
Bishop Agustín Romualdo Alvarez Rodríguez O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Machiques

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRenedo de Valdetuéjar, Spain

  • a priest for 62.4 years
  • a bishop for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 13 Aug 2011
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast