Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Alessandro, O.F.M. Cap.

Bishop of Garissa, Kenya


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1944 Born
30 Sep 196217.8ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
30 Sep 196621.8Perpetual VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
20 Dec 196925.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
5 Apr 197025.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
29 Jun 201267.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Garissa, Kenya
29 Sep 201267.8Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Garissa, Kenya
8 Dec 201571.0SucceededBishop of Garissa, Kenya

MicroData Summary for Joseph Alessandro
Bishop Joseph Alessandro O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Bishop of Garissa

EventPlace
Birth PlacePaola, Malta

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Garissa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Jun 2012
  • bd: CB, 5 Jul 2012
  • ob: CB, 31 Jul 2012
  • c2+: CB, 12 Aug 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,545
  • s: Bollettino, 8 Dec 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast