Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ascanio Argelati

Deceased

Bishop of Città della Pieve, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1676Born
24 Jun 170024.4Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jun 173559.4AppointedBishop of Città della Pieve, Italy
3 Jul 173559.4Ordained BishopBishop of Città della Pieve, Italy
23 Jun 173862.4DiedBishop of Città della Pieve, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ascanio Argelati
Bishop Ascanio Argelati (born , died ) Bishop of Città della Pieve

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBologna

  • a priest for 37.9 years
  • a bishop for 2.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 168
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1735, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast