Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo Onorato Buonocore

Deceased

Bishop of Trevico


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Aug 1700BornCelsa
18 Sep 172323.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
23 Dec 172424.3Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jul 173938.9AppointedBishop of Trevico, Italy
19 Jul 173938.9Ordained BishopBishop of Trevico, Italy
31 Dec 177373.3DiedBishop of Trevico, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Onorato Buonocore:
Bishop Bernardo Onorato Buonocore (born , died ) Bishop of Trevico

  • a priest for 49.0 years
  • a bishop for 34.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1739, Number 21
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 418

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015