Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo Costa, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Belluno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1699BornBassano
1716¹16.3ProfessedMember of Congregation of Clerics Regular
19 Sep 172223.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
15 Jul 173939.8AppointedBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
19 Jul 173939.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
29 May 174747.7AppointedBishop of Belluno, Italy
19 Aug 175555.9DiedBishop of Belluno, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Costa:
Bishop Giacomo Costa C.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Belluno

  • a priest for 32.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1753
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 120, and Page 358
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1739, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015