Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edwin Bernard Broderick

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Albany, New York


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1917BornNew York
30 May 194225.3Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
8 Mar 196750.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
8 Mar 196750.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Thizica
21 Apr 196750.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thizica
19 Mar 196952.1AppointedBishop of Albany, New York, USA
3 Jun 197659.3ResignedBishop of Albany, New York, USA
2 Jul 200689.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Albany, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Edwin Bernard Broderick:
Bishop Edwin Bernard Broderick (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Albany

  • a priest for 64.0 years
  • a bishop for 39.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015