Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Garmendia Ayestarán

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New York, New York

Titular Bishop of Limisa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1924BornLazcano, Spain
29 Jun 194722.6Ordained PriestPriest of Canons Regular of the Congregation of the Most Holy Saviour of the Lateran
197550.2IncardinatedPriest of New York, New York, USA
24 May 197752.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
24 May 197752.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Limisa
29 Jun 197752.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Limisa
30 Oct 200177.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
16 Nov 200581.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New York, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Francisco Garmendia Ayestarán:
Bishop Francisco Garmendia Ayestarán (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New York

  • a priest for 58.4 years
  • a bishop for 28.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013