Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude Ruffier

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1606¹BornProvins
8 Jul 165852.5AppointedBishop of Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux, France
12 Jan 165953.0Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux, France
16 Mar 167468.2DiedBishop of Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Claude Ruffier:
Bishop Claude Ruffier (died ) Bishop of Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux

  • a bishop for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 344
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1659, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 30 Mar 2015