Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roger de Harlay de Cési

Deceased

Bishop of Lodève, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1616¹Born
30 Jun 165741.4SelectedBishop of Lodève, France
24 Sep 165741.7ConfirmedBishop of Lodève, France
2 Jun 165842.4Ordained BishopBishop of Lodève, France
14 Mar 166953.2DiedBishop of Lodève, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Roger de Harlay de Cési
Bishop Roger de Harlay de Cési (born 1616, died ) Bishop of Lodève

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCési

  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 223
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1658, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast