Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas de Grillier

Deceased

Bishop of Uzés


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Dec 1630SelectedBishop of Bazas, France
24 Mar 1631ConfirmedBishop of Bazas, France
Jun 1631³Ordained BishopBishop of Bazas, France
1633¹ResignedBishop of Bazas, France
30 Apr 1633SelectedBishop of Uzés, France
3 Apr 1634ConfirmedBishop of Uzés, France
12 Feb 1660DiedBishop of Uzés, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolas de Grillier:
Bishop Nicolas de Grillier (died ) Bishop of Uzés

  • a bishop for 28.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 354, and Page 359
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1631, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 30 Mar 2015