Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Akinkunmi Oyejola

Bishop of Osogbo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1963 BornAawe
5 Oct 199128.4Ordained PriestPriest of Oyo, Nigeria
2 Apr 201652.9AppointedBishop of Osogbo, Nigeria
30 Jun 201653.1Ordained BishopBishop of Osogbo, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for John Akinkunmi Oyejola
Bishop John Akinkunmi Oyejola (born ) Bishop of Osogbo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Osogbo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Apr 2016
  • ob: CB, 18 Apr 2016
  • c2+: CB, 30 Jun 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,950

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 10 Jul 2016