Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angel Nicolás Acha Duarte

Deceased

Bishop of Carapeguá, Paraguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1930Born
27 Oct 195726.8Ordained PriestPriest of Villarrica, Paraguay
22 Dec 197545.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Villarrica, Paraguay
22 Dec 197545.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Lamdia
1 Mar 197645.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lamdia
5 Jun 197847.4AppointedBishop of Carapeguá, Paraguay
24 Jun 198251.5DiedBishop of Carapeguá, Paraguay

MicroData Summary for Angel Nicolás Acha Duarte
Bishop Angel Nicolás Acha Duarte (born , died ) Bishop of Carapeguá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceYbycuí
Ordained BishopAsunción, Archdiocese of Asunción

  • a priest for 24.6 years
  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 34, Number 2,101

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast