Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerónimo Tomás Abreu Herrera

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mao-Monte Cristi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1930BornJarabacoa
29 Jun 195524.7Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jan 197847.3AppointedBishop of Mao-Monte Cristi, Dominican Republic
4 Mar 197847.4Ordained BishopBishop of Mao-Monte Cristi, Dominican Republic
24 May 200675.7RetiredBishop of Mao-Monte Cristi, Dominican Republic
27 Jun 201281.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Mao-Monte Cristi, Dominican Republic

MicroData Summary for Jerónimo Tomás Abreu Herrera:
Bishop Jerónimo Tomás Abreu Herrera (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mao-Monte Cristi

  • a priest for 57.0 years
  • a bishop for 34.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 24 May 2006
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 124
  • d: CB, 27 Jun 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013