Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antoine Hamid Mourany

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Damas (Maronite), Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1930Born
11 Jun 196030.3Ordained PriestPriest of Damas (Maronite), Syria
5 Jun 198959.3AppointedArchbishop of Damas (Maronite), Syria
16 Sep 198959.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Damas (Maronite), Syria
10 Mar 199969.1ResignedArchbishop of Damas (Maronite), Syria
16 Apr 201282.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Damas (Maronite), Syria

MicroData Summary for Antoine Hamid Mourany
Archbishop Antoine Hamid Mourany (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Damas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKoubayat

  • a priest for 51.8 years
  • a bishop for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 19 Apr 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast