Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Dergham

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Le Caire {Cairo} (Maronite), Egypt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1930Born
12 Apr 195928.9Ordained PriestPriest
5 Jun 198959.1AppointedBishop of Le Caire {Cairo} (Maronite), Egypt
16 Sep 198959.3Ordained BishopBishop of Le Caire {Cairo} (Maronite), Egypt
18 Sep 200575.4RetiredBishop of Le Caire {Cairo} (Maronite), Egypt
28 Oct 201585.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Le Caire {Cairo} (Maronite), Egypt

MicroData Summary for Joseph Dergham
Bishop Joseph Dergham (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Le Caire {Cairo}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEbrine

  • a priest for 56.5 years
  • a bishop for 26.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,669
  • d: CB, 28 Oct 2015
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast